Rayar, Praveen Keshava (CPSO#: 95334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Phone: 905 450 0414
Fax: 905 450 0420
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10145 McVean Drive
ErinoakKids Centre for Treatment
and Development
Brampton ON  L6P4K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 855-2690
Fax: 905 794 3276
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Praveen Rayar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rayar ( CPSO# 95334 )

Business Address:
10145 McVean Drive
Brampton ON  L6P 4K7
Phone Number: (905) 855-2690

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Paediatrics Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRAVEEN KESHAVA RAYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016