Raymer, Karen Elise (CPSO#: 62690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 46698
Fax: (905) 577-8023
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Raymer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Raymer ( CPSO# 62690 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0217

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELISE RAYMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991