Raza, Syed Arsalan (CPSO#: 96185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dow Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cape Breton Regional Hospital
1482 George Street
Sydney NS  B1P 1P3
Phone: (902) 578-3896

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED ARSALAN RAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2016