Raza, Syed Naweed (CPSO#: 89925)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 24 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2018