Razavi, Amir Hossein (CPSO#: 97021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Nov 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone: (416) 2421000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Razavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Razavi ( CPSO# 97021 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Amir Hossein Razavi may practise medicine independently in internal
            medicine, only.