Razian, Ali (CPSO#: 80281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Razian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Razian ( CPSO# 80281 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI RAZIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2012 to 30 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2004