Razvi, Nayyar Kamal (CPSO#: 72573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0G4
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 477-2015
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CPM Hamilton
1605 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 1E6
Canada
Phone: (905) 574-4911
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

500 King Street West Unit 2
Oshawa ON  L1J2K9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-3444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

CPM Oakville
2125 Wyecroft Road Unit 6
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 842-7051
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

545 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 4W5
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nayyar Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Razvi ( CPSO# 72573 )

Business Address:
4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0G4
Phone Number: (905) 330-9828

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAYYAR KAMAL RAZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 15 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2000