Reaume, Martin Neil (CPSO#: 72696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70175
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Reaume Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reaume ( CPSO# 72696 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 237-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN NEIL REAUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REAUME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1999