Rebuck, Anthony Stuart (CPSO#: 41814)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2012