Reddy, Deven (CPSO#: 79329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 Matthew Street, Suite 101
Marietta Memorial Hospital
Marietta OH  45750
United States
Phone: 740-568-4150
Fax: 740-568-4151

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVEN REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2003