Reddy, Garisa Jagan Mohan (CPSO#: 90244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nolin Center
Lower Level
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone: (705) 675-2100
Fax: (705) 675-2101
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jagan Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Reddy ( CPSO# 90244 )

Business Address:
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Lower Level
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone Number: (705) 675-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARISA JAGAN MOHAN REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2009

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)