Reddy, Ramesh (CPSO#: 84302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
189 Elm St.
St Thomas Ont, N5R 5CR
St Thomas ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Commissioners Road East
Trauma Program
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519 685 8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Reddy ( CPSO# 84245 )
Dr. R. Reddy ( CPSO# 84302 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 639-9171

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMESH REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2008