Redekop, Kylie Justine (CPSO#: 97680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Louise Marshall Hospital
630 Dublin St
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone: 519-323-2210
Fax: 519-323-3741
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kylie J. Redekop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Redekop ( CPSO# 97680 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 323-2210

Business Address:
1485 Garrison Road
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 871-7621

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
1243 Islington Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 767-7725

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLIE JUSTINE REDEKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDEKOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014