Redfearn, Damian Paul (CPSO#: 81848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3377
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Redfearn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Redfearn ( CPSO# 81848 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Apr 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Apr 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAMIAN PAUL REDFEARN may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF CARDIOLOGY, QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. REDFEARN holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. REDFEARN may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. REDFEARN no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. REDFEARN no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. REDFEARN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2004 to 04 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015