Reed, David Edward (CPSO#: 90133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GI Division
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2332
Fax: (613) 544-3114
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Reed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Reed ( CPSO# 90133 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
GI Division
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD REED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2012