Reeve, Kate Christina (CPSO#: 90633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone: (416) 488-1455
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATE CHRISTINA REEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012