Rehman, Mujeeb Ur (CPSO#: 76946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2398
Fax: (905) 813-4284
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mujeeb Ur Rehman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rehman ( CPSO# 76946 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Room 2432
Mississauga ON  L5M 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 813-2398

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUJEEB UR REHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006