Reich, Dennis Agostino (CPSO#: 69956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Medical Centre
c/o Real Canadian Superstore
1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 5H7
Phone: (705) 222-7451
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Reich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Reich ( CPSO# 69956 )

Business Address:
Primary Medical Centre
Real Canadian Superstore
1485 LaSalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 5H7
Phone Number: (705) 222-7451

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS AGOSTINO REICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998