Reichert, Sonja Maria (CPSO#: 90018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Primary Care Diabetes Support Pgm
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 67268
Fax: (519) 645-6961
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonja M. Reichert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Reichert ( CPSO# 90018 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Primary Care Diabetes Support Program
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 646-9660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONJA MARIA REICHERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REICHERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 07 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011