Reichman, Trevor William (CPSO#: 90474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2019

Expiry Date:  06 Jan 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jan 2019

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Jan 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2019 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Trevor William Reichman may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  General  Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Reichman holds an academic  appointment  at  the  rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when  Dr.  Reichman
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on January 11, 2019, and currently has  an
                  interim  expiry  date  of January 6,  2022.   The  expiry  date  of  this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2.


                  ** Conversion terminated  at  this point (TRIAL version of software). For
            full functionality, click on "Purchase  Now"  in  the  installed product. Thank
            you.