Reid, Jessica Elizabeth (CPSO#: 84295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1S3
Phone: (705) 646-8957
Fax: (705) 646-1473
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica E. Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reid ( CPSO# 84295 )

Business Address:
9 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1S3
Phone Number: (705) 646-1043

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA ELIZABETH REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011