Reid, Sarah Maria (CPSO#: 73491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Emergency Medicine
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Fax: (613) 738-4885
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH MARIA REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2003