Reilly, Daniel Robert (CPSO#: 74888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Oct 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverview Medical Group
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-7418
Fax: (519) 787-7421
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Palmerston and District Hospital
North Wellington Health Care
500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Canada
Phone: (519) 343-2030
Fax: (519) 343-3821
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Reilly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Reilly ( CPSO# 74888 )

Business Address:
Riverview Medical Group
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-7418

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
Palmerston and District Hospital Foundation
500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 343-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 5, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Daniel Robert Reilly,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Reilly to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. DANIEL ROBERT REILLY
                                          ("Dr. Reilly")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Reilly, certificate of registration number 74888, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215396 (the "Investigation") into my
                  obstetrical/gynecological practice.


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.


            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for eight (8) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, no less than bi-weekly for two
                              months and further to the recommendation of the Supervisor
                              and further to the approval of the College, once a month for
                              six months;
                  
                        (iii) Review all gynecological surgeries booked or performed over
                              the last two weeks, or since the last supervision meeting,
                              and review up to five (5) vaginal hysterectomies performed by
                              Dr. Reilly over the last three (3) years and not previously
                              reviewed by Dr. Reilly's previous supervisor;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for the first two months and with the recommendation of
                              the Supervisor and further to the approval of the College,
                              every three months thereafter, or more frequently if the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of
                              practice.
                  
                        (viii)Keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient
                              identifiers.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the external reviews,
                        and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

                  (f)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease performing gynecological surgeries until
                        such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to
                        the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        performing gynecological surgeries as a result of section (5)(g)
                        above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my
                        certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation
                        will be included on the public register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    Obstetrics and Gynecology for Specialists and
                  
                              2.    Medical Record Keeping;
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Reilly, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reilly, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Reilly, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reilly, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Reilly's
                              obstetrical and gynecological practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Reilly will practise under the guidance of a
                                          Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
                                          eight (8) months. 
                  
                                    *     Dr. Reilly will engage in professional education
                                          in obstetrics/gynecology for specialists and
                                          medical record keeping.
                  
                                    *     Dr. Reilly's practice will be reassessed by an
                                          assessor selected by the College within three (3)
                                          months of the end of the period of Clinical
                                          Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Reilly, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Reilly, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Reilly, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 24, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: October 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Daniel Robert Reilly to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 5, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Reilly’s obstetrical and gynecological practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Reilly will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for eight (8) months.

Dr. Reilly will engage in professional education in obstetrics/gynecology for specialists and medical record keeping.

Dr. Reilly’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.