Reinders, Sabrina Mary Lim (CPSO#: 81209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Names: Reinders, Sabrina Lim (used until: 13 Oct 2010 )     Lim, Sabrina Mary (used until: 04 Nov 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network Bickle
130 Dunn Ave, Toronto
Administrative Office
M6K 2R7
Toronto ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 2106
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R6
Canada
Phone: 416-533-2828 Ext. 200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. M. Lim Reinders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABRINA MARY LIM REINDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REINDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2006