Reiss, Dina (CPSO#: 95281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Hospital
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252 Ext. 2271
Fax: (416) 461-2089
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dina Reiss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Reiss ( CPSO# 95281 )

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINA REISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012