Remington, Tamara Leah (CPSO#: 97468)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 20 May 2012
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 20 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014