Remtulla, Salma (CPSO#: 97733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: Noormohamed, Salma (used until: 24 Mar 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners - MH Site
CA Building, Ground Floor
15 Bronte College Court
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E7
Phone: 905-848-7653
Fax: 905-804-7741
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALMA REMTULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMTULLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2018