Remus, John Leonard (CPSO#: 21061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Oct 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ridgeway Clinic
1001 Ridgeway Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H8
Phone: (807) 623-7252
Fax: (807) 622-6427
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]

            (1 of 2)
            As  from  September 25, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Leonard Remus in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Remus to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Remus  must  practise  under  the  guidance  of a Clinical Supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.
                  
            (2 of 2)
            As from October 29, 2004, Dr. John Leonard Remus undertakes  to  the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that he will,

            1.    Perform "minor" orthopaedic surgery limited to outpatient procedures  and
                  which  is  considered,  for  the  purposes of Dr. Remus's Undertaking, to
                  consist of arthroscopy limited to the  knee,  and  other outpatient minor
                  surgical procedures limited to the elbow, wrist, hands, ankle or feet;

            2.    Continue  to  not participate in the on-call orthopaedic  roster  at  his
                  hospital;

            3.    Provide at least  three  months  written  notice to the Quality Assurance
                  Committee  of  the College if he wishes to resume  performing  any  other
                  orthopaedic surgical procedures or if he wishes to start participating in
                  the on-call orthopaedic roster; and

            4.    Comply with all assessment, review and enhancement activities directed by
                  the  Quality Assurance  Committee  before  resuming  performance  of  any
                  orthopaedic  surgical  procedures, either categorized as "major" (ie. not
                  delineated in paragraph  1  above)  or  taking  place  in  the  emergency
                  department.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)