Ren, Haifeng (CPSO#: 85038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
110 Copper Creek Dr.
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: 905-472-8911
Fax: 905-472-6081
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-2581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MCI - Woodbridge
200 Windflower Gate, Unit 700
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Canada
Phone: 905-856-2100
Fax: 905-856-2101
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

MCI - Bloor Street
345 Bloor Street East, Suite 4A
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Canada
Phone: 416-515-0590
Fax: 416-515-8853
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ten to Ten Medical Centre
777 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4S8
Canada
Phone: 905-949-5330
Fax: 905-949-0221
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Brampton Urgent Care Centre
51 Mountainash Rd, Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: 905-799-2722
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Pinnacle Health Sciences Scarboroug
Unit 208, 4125 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Canada
Phone: 416-546-0848
Fax: 416-546-1858
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Canada
Phone: 905-780-8823
Fax: 905-780-8821
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Ren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ren ( CPSO# 85038 )

Business Address:
Brampton Urgent Care Centre
51 Mountainash Road
Suite 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 799-2722

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Urgent Care
110 Copper Creek Drive
Suite 100
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Business Address:
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 780-8823

Business Address:
Pinnacle Health Sciences
Scarborough Centre
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 208
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 546-0848

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
39 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
MCI-Woodbridge
700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Phone Number: (905) 856-2100

Business Address:
777 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4S8
Phone Number: (905) 949-5330

Business Address:
MCI Bloor Street
4A-345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-0590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 27 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAIFENG REN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013