Ren, Jian Zhong (CPSO#: 87761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Site
Department of Laboratory Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 6034
Fax: (416) 431-8123
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jian Z. Ren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ren ( CPSO# 87761 )

Business Address:
Department of Laboratory Medicine
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIAN ZHONG REN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2008