Ren, Lei (CPSO#: 90805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Peking University Health Science Center, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
640 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1B5
Phone: 289-389-3686
Fax: 289-389-6474
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haibo Xu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Xu ( CPSO# 84946 )
Dr. L. Ren ( CPSO# 90805 )

Business Address:
Haldimand Family Health Team
Dunnville Site
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1T1
Phone Number: (905) 774-7541

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEI REN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2013 to 15 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 16 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2015