Ren, Yubo (CPSO#: 81945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Beijing Medical University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811 Ext. 8109
Fax: (613) 633-4598
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hazeldean Medical Clinic
436 Hazeldean Road
Suite 203
Kanata ON  K2L 1T9
Canada
Phone: (613) 369-8330
Fax: (613) 836-6882
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Ren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ren ( CPSO# 81945 )

Business Address:
Hazeldean Medical Clinic
Suite 203
436 Hazeldean Road
Kanata ON  K2L 1T9
Phone Number: (613) 369-8330

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUBO REN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Dec 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2007