Renaud, Kevin Andrew (CPSO#: 93911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11-88 Duncan Ave West
Penticton BC  V2A 7T1
Phone: (250) 460-3010
Fax: 8442263888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ANDREW RENAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENAUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018