Renehan, Elizabeth Mary (CPSO#: 72186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Aug 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MARY RENEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENEHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010