Renwick, Robert Benson (CPSO#: 93727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E, PO Box 5010
Zone B, Room B8-120
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 57139
Fax: 519-667-6564
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Renwick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Renwick ( CPSO# 93727 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences
Victoria Hospital
Room B8-120
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 3X2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BENSON RENWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENWICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011