Renz, Christine (CPSO#: 75155)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 18 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2005