Restrepo Garces, Carlos Eduardo (CPSO#: 85483)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 14 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2006 to 06 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2018 to 23 Oct 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 24 Oct 2018 to 31 Jul 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010