Reyes-Smith, Larina Masilang (CPSO#: 73130)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Xavier University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 1998 to 13 Nov 1998
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 1999 to 31 Mar 1999
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1999