Reynolds, Megan Amy (CPSO#: 88843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Emergency
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Lower Jarvis
Queen's Quay Medical
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Canada
Phone: (647) 827-9200
Fax: (647) 827-9202
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Megan Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reynolds ( CPSO# 88843 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Emergency
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6435

Business Address:
Queen's Quay Family Practice
10 Lower Jarvis
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN AMY REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2011