Reza, Erona (CPSO#: 93716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Family Health Team
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 250-5656
Fax: (519) 250-5864
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

VCare Clinics Urgent Care
2285 Howard Ave
Windsor ON  N8X 3V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-7979
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERONA REZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 27 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2013 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2013