Rezk, Mona Mahmoud (CPSO#: 94332)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 2013