Rezmovitz, Jeremy Joseph (CPSO#: 90989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Family Medicine
Room A 120
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4934
Fax: (416) 480-6038
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Rezmovitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rezmovitz ( CPSO# 90989 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Family Medicine
Room A101 & A120
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 706-5739

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY JOSEPH REZMOVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZMOVITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2011