Rhee, Jonathan (CPSO#: 88976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1S3
Phone: 705-646-2113
Fax: 705-646-1473
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Rhee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rhee ( CPSO# 88976 )

Business Address:
9 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1S3
Phone Number: (705) 645-7749

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN RHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013