Rhemtulla, El-Karim Fatehali Jaffer (CPSO#: 73467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Cambridge, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
274 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0B6
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: (905) 684-4996
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. El-Karim Rhemtulla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rhemtulla ( CPSO# 73467 )

Business Address:
Garden City Eyecare
Unit 3
274 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0B6
Phone Number: (905) 684-8521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EL-KARIM FATEHALI JAFFER RHEMTULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEMTULLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004