Riazi, Sheila (CPSO#: 81428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 ELIZABETH St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-3128
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Riazi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Riazi ( CPSO# 81428 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA RIAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009