Ribas, Carlos Sebastian (CPSO#: 78256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
Suite F541
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32800
Fax: (905)5216068
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-5274322 Ext. 40327
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Suite 109-311 Commercial St
Milton ON  L9T3Z9
Canada
Phone: 9058789805
Fax: 9058786358
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlos Ribas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ribas ( CPSO# 78256 )

Business Address:
St. Josephs Health Centre
Helen Fontbonne Building Room F541
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Carlos Sebastian Ribas may practise medicine independently in cardiology.