Rice, Brenda Lynn (CPSO#: 96729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5063
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Rice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rice ( CPSO# 96729 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5063

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 09 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Respirology Effective: 01 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Brenda Lynn Rice may practice medicine independently in respirology and
            critical care medicine, only.