Richards, Crispen Gray (CPSO#: 77892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Ewen Rd.
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone: 9055401500
Fax: 9055401501
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Crispen Richards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Richards ( CPSO# 77892 )

Business Address:
10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone Number: (905) 540-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISPEN GRAY RICHARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007