Richards-Bentley, Christopher Matthew (CPSO#: 95411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health and Wellness Centre
Koffler Student Services Centre
University of Toronto
214 College Street, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: (416) 978-7341
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Springboard Clinic
Suite 301
1055 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4W2L2
Canada
Phone: (416) 901-3077
Fax: (416) 901-3079
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CAMH
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T1L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

183 Glenrose Avenue
Toronto ON  M4T1K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 754-8358
Fax: (416) 484-9900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MATTHEW RICHARDS-BENTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS-BENTLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016