Ricketts, John Douglas (CPSO#: 66593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Imaging Services
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KMI X-Ray and Ultra Sound
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Canada
Phone: (613) 384-5488
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. Ricketts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
KMI X-Ray and Ultrasound
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-5488

Business Address:
Department of Imaging Services
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS RICKETTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICKETTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1998